+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Returned to Rules.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Returned to Rules.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On March 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor