+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Effective date 7/23/2017.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 260, 2017 Laws. (View Session Law)
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 21, 2017 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 40; nays, 9; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- House insists on its position and asks Senate to concur.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments.
On April 12, 2017 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 24, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- COG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CLS 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor