+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass.
- CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor