+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (32)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 7, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Judiciary. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor