+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019*.
- Chapter 291, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 15, 2019 in the House:
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 84; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 5, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- RDAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
On March 20, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture, & Natural Resources.
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWNP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)