+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 193, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
- Speaker signed.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 17, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 6, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- LAWS - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 25, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LBRC - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:05 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor