+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor