+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 11, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Governor signed.
- Chapter 237, 2015 Laws.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Committee amendment not adopted.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- HCW - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HLTH 15).
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Health Care.
+ − Amendments (3)
5557-S.E AMH SHOR H2682.1
ADOPTED 04/14/2015
5557-S.E AMH HCW H2487.1
NOT ADOPTED 04/14/2015
5557-S AMS PARL S2038.2
ADOPTED 03/02/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor