+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- CYF - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 16, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Children, Youth & Families at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Children, Youth & Families.
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 22). (View 1st Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.