+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 21, 2018 in the House:
- Effective date 6/7/2018*.
- Chapter 145, 2018 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 9, 2018 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On February 23, 2018 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 77; nays, 20; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended.
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 20, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LAW 18). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)