+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 398, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 29, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 27, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- CRJ - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 6, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary.
On March 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)