+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 14, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 264, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted as amended.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
- Minority; do not pass.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:30 AM.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FI 15).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 5:30 PM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM.
On January 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance.
+ − Amendments (3)
5538-S AMH ENGR H2698.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 04/13/2015
5538-S AMH JINK H2655.1
ADOPTED 04/13/2015
5538-S AMH JUDI ADAM 044
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 04/13/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor