+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Labor & Commerce.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 12:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)