+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 3, 2015 in the House:
- FIN - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor