+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules Green Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRAN 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)