+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (31)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 27, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules.
On June 23, 2015 in the House:
- Placed on third reading.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Returned to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GGIT - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- PS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 10:00 AM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Public Safety (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 34; nays, 15; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 6:00 PM.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor