+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Effective date 6/9/2022.
- Chapter 224, 2022 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On March 11, 2022 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On March 9, 2022 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On March 4, 2022 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted with no other amendments.
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 17, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 7, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On January 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)
On December 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Prefiled for introduction.