+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 3, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- SGOV - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Relations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- SGTE - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 5:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to State Government, Tribal Relations & Elections. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor