+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On April 25, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 117, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 83; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM.
On April 6, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On March 26, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM.
- ELHS - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 20, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 15).
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- HSMH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services and Mental Health & Housing at 10:00 AM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor