+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 91, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 10, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
- SG - Majority; do pass.
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 9, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- GOS - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor