+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 18, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 7/24/2015.
- Chapter 292, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 13, 2015 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM.
- TR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 23, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (TRAN 15).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
5481-S AMH TR H2637.1
ADOPTED 04/14/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor