+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 1:30 PM.
On March 5, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HLTH 15).
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- HLTH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM.
On February 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Health Care.
On January 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- And refer to Health Care.
- CL - Majority; without recommendation.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
+ − Amendment
5477-S AMS DAMM S2148.1
ADOPTED 03/03/2015
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor