+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Energy, Environment & Technology.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Technology & Economic Development (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- EET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, Environment & Telecommunications at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor