+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 19, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 17, 2015 in the House:
- LG - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 1:30 PM.
On March 2, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (AWRD 15).
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
+ − Amendment
5470-S AMS WARN S1955.1
ADOPTED 02/27/2015
+ − Sponsor
Warnick
Type:
Primary Sponsor