+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 334, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 1; absent, 1; excused, 4.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
- JUDI - Executive action taken by committee.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (HSC 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- HSC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On February 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM.
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections.
+ − Amendment
5456-S AMH JUDI H2291.1
ADOPTED 04/17/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor