+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 7, 2014 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM.
On March 5, 2014 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Finance (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; do pass.
On February 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On January 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- TRAN - Majority; do pass.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
+ − Amendment
5430 AMS HOBB S4818.1
ADOPTED 03/04/2014
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor