+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)