+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2025 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 3, 2025 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2025 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:30 AM.
- ENET - Majority; do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 5, 2025 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM.
On January 22, 2025 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology.
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor