+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 333, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 27, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 25, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 34; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 87; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 5.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM.
- LG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- LG - Executive action taken by committee.
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 21, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:00 AM.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Local Government (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 27; nays, 22; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- GOV - Majority; do pass.
On February 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 6:00 PM.
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Governmental Operations at 10:00 AM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Governmental Operations.
+ − Amendments (2)
5417 AMS BENT S2063.1
PULLED 03/13/2013
5417 AMH LG H2233.1
ADOPTED 04/09/2013
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor