+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LCTA - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 8:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs at 10:30 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor, Commerce & Tribal Affairs. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor