+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (18)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 14, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 29; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (FI 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- FI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. (View Original Bill)