+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 13, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2013 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 22, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 20, 2013 in the House:
- ENVI - Majority; do pass.
- ENVI - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM.
On March 19, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM.
On March 5, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Environment (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- EET - Majority; do pass.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Energy, and Environment & Telecommunications at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Energy, Environment & Telecommunications.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor