+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On May 14, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013.
- Chapter 234, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 18, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 16, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 78; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On April 10, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On March 28, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On March 26, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Government Accountability & Oversight at 1:30 PM.
- OVER - Executive action taken by committee.
- OVER - Majority; do pass.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Government Accountability & Oversight (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 35; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CL 13).
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 27, 2013 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- CL - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On February 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Commerce & Labor at 1:30 PM.
On January 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Labor.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor