+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 6, 2015 in the House:
- Effective date 1/1/2016**.
- Chapter 176, 2015 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 23, 2015 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
- President signed.
On April 21, 2015 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 8, 2015 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments.
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM.
On March 3, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Amendment
5387 AMH JUDI H2405.2
ADOPTED 04/08/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor