+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 25, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 12, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education.
On February 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. (View Original Bill)