+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Security at 10:00 AM.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Government Operations & State Security.
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor