+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 26, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM.
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 33; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 0.
On February 12, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM.
On March 13, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Judiciary (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Made eligible to be placed on second reading.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; do not pass.
- LAW - Majority; do pass.
On February 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
+ − Amendments (2)
5363 AMS ROLF S2496.1
NOT ADOPTED 03/11/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor