+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 7, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Capital Budget.
On March 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 21). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)