+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2022 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 14, 2022 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
On January 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Placed on third reading by Rules Committee.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 2, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 31, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2021 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- TRAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 4:00 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Transportation. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor