+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Law & Justice.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- LAW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Law & Justice. (View Original Bill)