+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM.
- GGIT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Agriculture & Natural Resources.
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to General Government & Information Technology.
- Minority; do not pass.
- AGNR - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM.
On March 10, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 15).
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Minority; do not pass.
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
On February 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- On motion, referred to Ways & Means.
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- AWRD - Majority; do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor