+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 7, 2013 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2013*.
- Chapter 159, 2013 Laws.
- Governor signed.
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor.
On April 23, 2013 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 22, 2013 in the House:
- President signed.
On April 19, 2013 in the House:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 2.
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 15, 2013 in the House:
- Committee amendment adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 68; nays, 29; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 8, 2013 in the House:
- Minority; do not pass.
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Education.
- APP - Executive action taken by committee.
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On April 5, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM.
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 29, 2013 in the House:
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
- ED - Executive action taken by committee.
- ED - Majority; do pass with amendment(s).
- Minority; do not pass.
On March 15, 2013 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 9, 2013 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 30; nays, 19; absent, 0; excused, 0.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 13).
On March 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Minority; do not pass.
- Minority; without recommendation.
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
- Minority; do not pass.
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
On February 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM.
On January 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendments (10)
5329-S2 AMS RANK GREL 285 (AMD 134 )
5329-S2 AMS RANK GREL 285 (AMD 134 )
5329-S2.E AMH ED H2229.1
NOT CONSIDERED 04/15/2013
5329-S2.E AMH LYTT MCLA 880
ADOPTED 04/15/2013
5329-S2.E AMH ENGR H2372.E
ADOPTED AND ENGROSSED 04/15/2013
5329-S2.E AMH APP H2372.1
ADOPTED AS AMENDED 04/15/2013
5329-S2 AMS LITZ S2051.1
ADOPTED 03/07/2013
5329-S2 AMS BILL MIEL 136
ADOPTED 03/07/2013
5329-S2 AMS BILL S2070.1
NOT ADOPTED AS AMENDED 03/07/2013
5329-S2 AMS BILL MIEL 135
ADOPTED 03/07/2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor