+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 8, 2018 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On February 16, 2018 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Transportation (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On February 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On February 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On January 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Moved to Rules White Sheet.
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Returned to Rules.
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Ways & Means. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor