+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (40)
On May 13, 2019 in the House:
- Effective date 7/28/2019.
- Chapter 394, 2019 Laws. (View Session Law)
- Governor signed.
On April 26, 2019 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor. (View Bill as Passed Legislature)
On April 25, 2019 in the House:
- Speaker signed.
On April 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- President signed.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed final passage; yeas, 43; nays, 4; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
- Senate concurred in House amendments.
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee amendment not adopted.
- Committee amendment(s) adopted as amended.
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 88; nays, 8; absent, 0; excused, 2. (View Roll Calls)
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading.
On April 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) but without amendment(s) by Commerce & Gaming. (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- COG - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 13, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (LBRC 19). (View 1st Substitute)
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 3. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Labor & Commerce. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:20 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- LBRC - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 5:45 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Labor & Commerce at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Commerce. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor