+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (20)
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 11, 2016 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 16, 2015 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM.
On March 6, 2015 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Education (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st substitute bill substituted (EDU 15).
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 13, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation.
- EDU - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM.
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education.
+ − Amendments (2)
5316-S AMS DAMM S2063.3
ADOPTED 03/04/2015
5316-S AMS DAMM S2063.1
PULLED 03/04/2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor