+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On March 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWRD - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass.
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture and Water & Rural Economic Development at 8:00 AM.
On January 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water & Rural Economic Development.
+ − Sponsor
Warnick
Type:
Primary Sponsor