+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (34)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Consideration.
On April 6, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- APP - Majority; do pass with amendment(s) by Labor & Workplace Standards. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
On April 3, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On April 1, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Appropriations.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- Minority; do not pass. (Minority Report)
- LAWS - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing and executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Labor & Workplace Standards at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 9, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Labor & Workplace Standards (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 25; nays, 24; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View 1st Engrossed) (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- Floor amendment(s) adopted.
- 1st substitute bill substituted (CLS 17). (View 1st Substitute)
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- CLS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Commerce, Labor & Sports at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Commerce, Labor & Sports. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor