+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On February 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 28, 2019 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 14, 2019 in the House:
- First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Relations.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 19). (View 2nd Substitute)
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
On March 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
- Minority; without recommendation. (Minority Report)
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
On February 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- ENET - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. (View Original Bill)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor