+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Rules "X" file.
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 25, 2021 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- RDAN - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Rural Development, Agriculture & Natural Resources.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. (View Roll Calls)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading consent calendar.
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- AWNP - Majority; do pass. (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Natural Resources & Parks. (View Original Bill)