+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
- Senate Rules "X" file.
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
On April 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on Rules White Sheet.
On April 23, 2017 in the House:
- By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading.
On March 28, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules 2 Review.
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment(s). (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 21, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 16, 2017 in the House:
- Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On March 3, 2017 in the House:
- First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs (Not Officially read and referred until adoption of Introduction report).
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Placed on second reading by Rules Committee.
- Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. (View Roll Calls)
- 2nd substitute bill substituted (WM 17). (View 2nd Substitute)
- Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading.
On February 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed to Rules Committee for second reading.
- WM - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 2nd Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 11:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. (Committee Materials)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Ways & Means.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- And refer to Ways & Means.
- AWTE - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. (View 1st Substitute) (Majority Report)
- Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On February 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development at 8:00 AM. (Committee Materials)
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- First reading, referred to Agriculture, Water, Trade & Economic Development. (View Original Bill)